Financial history ALDER HEY CHILDREN'S CHARITY

Charity number: 1160661
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £7.71m £5.84m £4.72m £4.73m £6.63m
Total expenditure £6.66m £6.49m £4.25m £5.87m £7.67m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £36.00k £41.95k
Income - Donations and legacies £5.94m £3.64m £2.46m £3.19m £4.39m
Income - Other trading activities £466.00k £769.00k £700.00k £422.00k £722.00k
Income - Charitable activities £1.22m £1.34m £1.46m £1.05m £1.42m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £77.00k £97.00k £103.00k £71.00k £103.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £2.12m £418.00k £253.00k £204.00k £544.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.44m £5.48m £3.24m £4.63m £5.95m
Expenditure - Raising funds £799.00k £984.00k £1.01m £1.24m £1.72m
Expenditure - Governance £112.00k £107.00k £74.00k £119.00k £128.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £2.82m £4.16m £5.41m
Expenditure - Investment management £26.00k £26.00k £26.00k £22.00k £36.00k
Expenditure - Other £424.00k £24.00k £2.00k £0 £0