Trustees ALDER HEY CHILDREN'S CHARITY

Charity number: 1160661
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Richard Roulston Turnock Trustee 27 January 2021
None on record
GRAHAM JOHN MORRIS Trustee 27 March 2019
None on record
Sarah Robinson Trustee 15 January 2019
None on record
Paul Bibby Trustee 15 January 2019
STUDENT FUTURES
Received: On time
THE SPEEDOMICK FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Kirsty Muir Trustee 15 January 2019
None on record
DAME JOSEPHINE WILLIAMS DBE BA DL Trustee 01 November 2017
None on record
JOHN KENDAL CARSON Trustee 31 January 2017
None on record
EILEEN FRANCES JONES Trustee 31 January 2017
None on record
Glynis Steen Johnston Trustee 31 January 2017
THE MERCHANT TAYLORS' SCHOOLS CROSBY
Received: On time
SHALNI ARORA Trustee 31 January 2017
SAVANNAH WISDOM
Received: On time
THE BRITISH ASIAN TRUST
Received: On time
THE COHESION AND INTEGRATION NETWORK
Received: On time