THE DALAI LAMA CENTRE FOR COMPASSION

Charity number: 1164491
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £246.93k £189.13k £37.78k £52.40k £63.25k
Total expenditure £122.79k £134.67k £89.36k £67.77k £49.34k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A