Financial history ANAWIM - BIRMINGHAM’S CENTRE FOR WOMEN LIMITED

Charity number: 1159706
Charity reporting is up to date (7 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £1.13m £1.32m £1.34m £1.79m £1.89m
Total expenditure £1.02m £1.20m £1.52m £1.71m £1.86m
Income from government contracts £217.93k £372.34k £452.07k £579.67k £650.95k
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £203.22k £203.16k £84.91k £175.72k £198.17k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £9.40k £0
Income - Charitable activities £922.08k £1.11m £1.23m £1.55m £1.66m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.24k £856 £0 £23.32k £17.96k
Income - Other £0 £6.04k £22.79k £31.70k £14.46k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.02m £1.17m £1.48m £1.67m £1.82m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £34.16k £36.64k £38.04k £39.52k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £14.40k £13.83k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0