Trustees ANAWIM - BIRMINGHAM’S CENTRE FOR WOMEN LIMITED
Charity number: 1159706

Charity reporting is up to date (7 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
lynne Moran | Chair | 19 March 2019 |
|
|||||
Fiona Mctaggart | Trustee | 09 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ahmad Mortazavi | Trustee | 10 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Joan Kemshall | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Michael Heath | Trustee | 07 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Harriet Ann Bignell | Trustee | 23 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Siobhan Marie Hughes | Trustee | 28 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Monica Ghai | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paula Mitchell | Trustee | 18 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sister Anne Josephine Carr | Trustee | 19 March 2020 |
|
|||||
SISTER ROSEMARY KEAN | Trustee | 05 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Janet Hemlin | Trustee | 08 September 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.