CUCKMERE HAVEN SOS

Charity Number: 1161529
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To promote for the benefit of the public the conservation, protection and improvement of the physical and natural environment of the Cuckmere Haven West Beach and Cliffs

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £23,375
Total expenditure: £46,331

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • East Sussex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 May 2015: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Professor Michael Charles Radcliffe Davies CEng FICE Chair 09 March 2021
THE ISSMGE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
CHRIST COLLEGE, BRECON
Received: On time
Dr Caroline Lucas Trustee 15 January 2025
TOWNER
Received: On time
Daniel De Belder Trustee 11 November 2021
None on record
Charles Russell Peck Trustee 10 October 2020
None on record
Sir Alan George Moses Trustee 22 February 2020
None on record
CRISPIN PATRICK FREEMAN Trustee 29 April 2017
THE LAWRENCE CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
Berwick PCC
Received: On time
JOHN JACKSON CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
R CASTLEDEN ESQ MA, MSC OXON Trustee 05 May 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £39.83k £6.09k £19.63k £5.61k £23.38k
Total expenditure £8.27k £24.49k £21.75k £2.49k £46.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 06 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 06 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 23 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 23 September 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 23 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 23 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 26 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 July 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Sanctuary
Winton Street
Alfriston
POLEGATE
BN26 5UL
Phone:
07506726638