ALPHA TRUST SOM-UK LTD

Charity number: 1162975
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 09 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 05 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2018 28 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2017 13 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2016 04 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 Not Required