ALPHA TRUST SOM-UK LTD

Charity number: 1162975
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £5.04k £18.36k £5.93k £5.72k £10.47k
Total expenditure £4.73k £12.26k £12.03k £3.55k £6.48k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A