Financial history WHARFEDALE AGRICULTURAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1161008
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £0 £102.98k £105.49k £10.91k £6.57k
Total expenditure £0 £109.91k £104.07k £27.21k £15.43k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A