Accounts and annual returns FAIRFIELD FOR YOU RESIDENTS COMMITTEE

Charity number: 1161171
Charity reporting is overdue by 1767 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 306 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 306 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 671 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 671 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1036 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1036 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1402 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1402 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1767 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1767 days