Governance GREAT ORMOND STREET HOSPITAL CHILDREN'S CHARITY
Charity number: 1160024
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
- 19 January 2015: Standard registration
- 24 May 2018: Funds received from 279344 THE AGHIA PHILOTHEI TRUST
- 22 June 2018: Funds received from 1108561 THE MARTIN AND ZOE HARRIS CHARITABLE TRUST
- 12 November 2018: Funds received from 1070177 THE PHILIP ULLMANN TRUST
- 03 February 2021: Funds received from 1094970 GOAL 4 KIDS
- 11 May 2021: Funds received from 1098725 FORMER EMS LIMITED
- 24 November 2021: Funds received from 1160024-113 THE FRIENDS OF THE CHILDREN OF GREAT ORMOND STREET
- 03 February 2022: Funds received from 1003825 SPARKS CHARITY
- 09 January 2024: Funds received from 1152652 THE STANLEY MCLEAN TRUST
- 26 January 2024: Funds received from 1100678 THE HEART OF DARTS
- 15 March 2024: Funds received from 1161662 SALVATION OF THE LIVING ROCK REVEALED
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
- GOSH (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.