WISDOM (ZHIHUI) FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1162663
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Anastasia Petrova Trustee 05 November 2019
FIORENTINI FOUNDATION Received: On time
Mona Han Trustee 01 April 2018 None on record
Ciayi Lim Trustee 14 July 2018 None on record
Catherine Vriginia Skyla Nicholls Chair 05 November 2019 None on record
Jian Gong Trustee 01 September 2016 None on record
BETTY YEUNG Trustee 14 July 2016 None on record