Financial history NEWCIS

Charity number: 1159934
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.09m £980.78k £1.31m £1.54m £1.77m
Total expenditure £1.10m £865.51k £1.32m £1.45m £1.59m
Income from government contracts £903.94k £600.19k £829.82k £1.37m £1.69m
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £66.26k £14.55k £464 £1.84k £28.83k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £1.24k £117.05k £156.59k £47.67k
Income - Charitable activities £1.02m £951.82k £1.19m £1.37m £1.69m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £1.11k £2.93k £709 £304
Income - Other £3.23k £13.30k £1.54k £14.38k £9.51k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.10m £864.27k £1.19m £1.28m £1.37m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £1.24k £129.17k £176.65k £217.47k
Expenditure - Governance £3.75k £2.46k £1.80k £1.80k £1.80k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £161.93k £276.36k £316.10k £434.08k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £708 £3.02k £245 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0