FISHING INTO THE FUTURE

Charity number: 1160123
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 21 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 01 December 2018 28 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 December 2018 28 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 01 December 2017 20 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

20 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 01 December 2016 23 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

23 August 2017 On time Download