FISHING INTO THE FUTURE

Charity number: 1160123
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

18 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
James Kelly Trustee 28 September 2021 None on record
David Anderson Trustee 28 September 2021 None on record
Dr Alexa Dayton Trustee 23 January 2015 None on record
Trevor William Jones Trustee 28 September 2021 None on record
Ashley Mullenger Trustee 28 September 2021
WELLS HARBOUR MARITIME TRUST Received: On time
David Stevens Chair 01 May 2018 None on record
Hazel Curtis Trustee 01 May 2018 None on record
Adrian Bartlett Trustee 01 May 2018 None on record
SEAN DENNISON Trustee 23 January 2015 None on record
Jimmy Buchan Trustee 01 May 2018 None on record
Peter Bruce Trustee 16 June 2020 None on record
Hannah Fennell Trustee 28 September 2021 None on record
ALAN STEER Trustee 23 January 2015 None on record
Neil Witney Trustee 28 September 2021 None on record
STEVEN MACKINSON Trustee 23 January 2015 None on record
Professor Michel Kaiser Trustee 05 March 2020 None on record
Michael Park OBE Trustee 28 September 2021 None on record
Mike Warner Trustee 01 May 2018 None on record