SWANSEA ST MARY'S CHORAL TRUST

Charity number: 1160907
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 28 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 18 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 15 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 24 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2016 03 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 Not Required