THE WOKINGHAM VOLUNTEER CENTRE

Charity number: 1161498
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Graham Powell Chair 27 September 2017 None on record
Philip Anthony Cleary Trustee 11 September 2019 None on record
DAVID KNEE Trustee 23 November 2014 None on record
Geraldine Patricia Durrant Trustee 09 December 2019 None on record
Martin Jeater Trustee 27 July 2016 None on record
David Vaughan Trustee 20 January 2008 None on record