Accounts and annual returns INCLUSIVELY TAEKWONDO

Charity number: 1160621
Charity reporting is overdue by 413 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2023 Overdue Overdue by 47 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Overdue Overdue by 47 days
Annual return 30 June 2022 Overdue Overdue by 413 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Overdue Overdue by 413 days
Annual return 30 June 2021 08 September 2022 131 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 08 September 2022 131 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 08 September 2022 496 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 08 September 2022 496 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2019 08 September 2022 861 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 08 September 2022 861 days late Download Open in new window