Financial history THE GREIG TRUST

Charity number: 1160318
Charity reporting is up to date (29 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £567.15k £542.38k £398.93k £310.13k £263.39k
Total expenditure £675.82k £712.13k £730.39k £916.32k £842.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £567.15k £542.38k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £568.88k £614.60k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £106.94k £97.53k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £9.82k £6.84k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £582.46k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £106.94k £97.53k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A