Accounts and annual returns The Balance Eco Foundation

Charity number: 1162529
Charity reporting is overdue by 87 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 87 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 87 days
Annual return 31 August 2020 07 July 2021 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 27 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 16 December 2019 169 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 07 March 2019 250 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required