ST. MICHAEL'S ANTIOCHIAN ORTHODOX PARISH, STOKE-ON-TRENT

Charity number: 1165646
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 15 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 01 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 01 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 30 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 30 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 30 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 30 January 2018 On time Download