Financial history ST. MICHAEL'S ANTIOCHIAN ORTHODOX PARISH, STOKE-ON-TRENT

Charity number: 1165646
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £45.73k £45.66k £43.82k £37.41k £61.01k
Total expenditure £32.59k £32.81k £37.50k £31.95k £63.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £1.00k N/A