Financial history ALDER TRUST

Charity number: 1160393
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021
Total gross income £17.83k £210.31k £237.38k £104.49k £154.88k
Total expenditure £23.75k £11.80k £57.21k £91.77k £148.05k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A