Accounts and annual returns TRANSITIONS UK

Charity number: 1160105
Charity is insolvent
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2023 Overdue Overdue by 54 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Overdue Overdue by 54 days
Annual return 31 May 2022
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022
Annual return 31 May 2021
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021
Annual return 31 May 2020
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020
Annual return 31 May 2019
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019