THE INTERNATIONAL CENTRE FOR BIRDS OF PREY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
See Trustees Report and Accounts
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 02 January 2015: Standard registration
- ICBP (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ruth Wadley | Trustee | 31 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Paul Thomas Ernest Symonds | Trustee | 31 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
James Gilchrist | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Richard Aspinall | Trustee | 12 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philip John Madelin | Trustee | 13 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew William Baldwin | Trustee | 24 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY JULIAN RICE | Trustee | 24 August 2021 |
|
|||||
Richard Henry James Kerr-Wilson | Trustee | 31 July 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £389.70k | £286.16k | £499.28k | £1.27m | £154.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £371.90k | £310.50k | £376.35k | £367.01k | £258.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £100.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £59.99k | £26.50k | £4.00k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £967.05k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £301.84k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £430 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £952.50k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £362.01k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5.00k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £13.53k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 11 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 11 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 11 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17 NOV 2014 as amended on 14 Apr 2023 as amended on 04 Dec 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CENTRE FOR BIRDS OF PREY ARE TO: 4.1.1 PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF ALL SPECIES OF RAPTORS (BIRDS OF PREY AND OWLS) TOGETHER WITH THEIR VARYING HABITATS WORLDWIDE THROUGH, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY, CONSERVATION BREEDING PROGRAMMES, AND RESEARCH INTO THE BREEDING, HABITAT, HEALTH AND CONSERVATION OF ALL BIRDS OF PREY 4.1.2 ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND UNDERSTANDING OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY IN THE CONSERVATION. PRESERVATION AND WELFARE OF RAPTORS WORLDWIDE THROUGH EXTERNAL LECTURES, PAPERS AT CONFERENCES AND THROUGH THE WEBSITE, TO INSTIL, AMONGST OTHE THINGS, THE IMPORTANCE OF SPECIES OF RAPTORS AND THEIR DIVERSE HABITATS IN THE WILD; AND 4.1.3 ADVANCE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY BE CONDUCIVE TO THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF RAPTORS AS THE DIRECTORS MAY IN THEIR DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC
Contact information
- Address:
-
BOULDSON HOUSE
NEWENT
GLOUCESTERSHIRE
GL18 1JJ
- Phone:
- 01531820286
- Email:
- info@icbp.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window