The Sevenoaks CPR Charity

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Sevenoaks CPR Charity provides free public CPR & AED training and helps establish and maintain PAD sites in the community. It has also provided equipment to local Community First Responders
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 03 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 30 January 2015: Standard registration
- SEVENOAKSCFR (Working name)
- SEVENOAKS COMMUNITY FIRST RESPONDERS (Previous name)
- The Sevenoaks CFR Charity (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stan Willis | Chair | 29 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Adam John Spears | Trustee | 16 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
JAMES CRAWLEY | Trustee | 29 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Smart | Trustee | 29 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
TIM HALL | Trustee | 29 January 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 03/03/2020 | 03/03/2021 | 03/03/2022 | 03/03/2023 | 03/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.71k | £2.60k | £2.30k | £5.34k | £1.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.72k | £3.40k | £4.84k | £4.24k | £2.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 03 March 2024 | 27 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 03 March 2023 | 17 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 03 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 03 March 2021 | 18 March 2022 | 74 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 03 March 2020 | 01 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 NOV 2014 AS AMENDED ON 29/01/2015 AS AMENDED ON 28 MAR 2019 AS AMENDED ON 19 FEB 2020 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 14 APR 2020
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH AND THE SAVING OF LIVES IN THE SEVENOAKS DISTRICT AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY PROVIDING FREE PUBLIC CARDIOPULMONARY RESUSCITATION (CPR) AND AUTOMATIC EXTERNAL DEFIBRILATOR (AED) TRAINING AND THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF AED PUBLIC ACCESS DEFIBRILLATOR (PAD) SITES IN THE COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
IN THE SEVENOAKS DISTRICT AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 St. Ediths Road
Kemsing
Sevenoaks
TN15 6PT
- Phone:
- 00000000
- Email:
- INFO@SEVENOAKSCPR.ORG
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window