Accounts and annual returns HOLLYWELL HOUSING TRUST

Charity number: 1160398
Charity reporting is overdue by 499 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 134 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 134 days
Annual return 31 March 2022
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022
Annual return 31 March 2021
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021
Annual return 31 March 2020
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020
Annual return 31 March 2019
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019