Financial history HOLLYWELL HOUSING TRUST

Charity number: 1160398
Charity reporting is overdue by 535 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £202.04k £502.39k £652.87k £912.48k £974.56k
Total expenditure £202.55k £522.54k £623.41k £790.87k £1.01m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £63.24k £70.00k £239.72k £152.41k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £439.15k £582.87k £672.76k £822.15k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £521.64k £623.41k £790.87k £1.01m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £900 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A £2.24k £3.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0