SKILLS &TRAINING NETWORK

Charity number: 1161029
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 October 2020 08 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 October 2020 08 February 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 October 2019 14 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 October 2019 14 May 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 October 2018 18 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 October 2018 18 February 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 October 2017 12 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 October 2017 12 March 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 October 2016 13 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 October 2016 13 December 2016 On time Download