SKILLS &TRAINING NETWORK

Charity number: 1161029
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/10/2016 30/10/2017 30/10/2018 30/10/2019 30/10/2020
Total gross income £49.03k £120.40k £74.89k £92.60k £194.02k
Total expenditure £42.96k £94.21k £55.88k £88.16k £107.67k
Income from government contracts £0 £30.85k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A