EAST LONDON MUSIC GROUP

Charity number: 1160841
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £9.60k £9.76k £6.09k £26.62k £18.24k
Total expenditure £15.28k £6.98k £7.69k £13.48k £8.33k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A £3.77k £3.65k
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A