Accounts and annual returns MRS D M FRANCE-HAYHURST FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1160394
Charity reporting is up to date (9 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 March 2021 08 February 2022 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2021 08 February 2022 9 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 20 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 20 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 14 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 14 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 12 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 12 December 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 25 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 25 October 2017 On time Download Open in new window