SEAHAM YOUTH CENTRE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE

Charity number: 505581
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Youth and community work. Activities as described in section 2 of constitutional document.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2014

Total income: £22,223
Total expenditure: £28,479

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Durham

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 April 1977: Standard registration
  • 10 December 2015: Removed (Transfer of funds)
  • 10 December 2015: Funds transferred to 1163327 SEAHAM YOUTH CENTRE
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • SEAHAM YOUTH CENTRE (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2009 31/12/2010 31/12/2012 31/12/2013 31/12/2014
Total gross income £58.42k £64.29k £27.13k £45.76k £22.22k
Total expenditure £49.77k £61.76k £34.67k £39.45k £28.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2014 01 April 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2013 15 April 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 01 April 2015 152 days late
Annual return 31 December 2012 11 April 2014 162 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2012 11 April 2014 162 days late
Annual return 31 December 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 Not submitted