SHEFFIELD FAMILY HOLIDAY FUND

Charity number: 505590
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £30.36k £38.41k £27.00k £28.38k £26.80k
Total expenditure £30.00k £970 £27.00k £30.08k £11.08k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A