SHEFFIELD FAMILY HOLIDAY FUND

Charity number: 505590
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Meadows Trustee 01 November 2014
DERWENT COTTAGE HOLIDAY FUND Received: On time
NICK BOLTON Trustee 28 October 2011
DERWENT COTTAGE HOLIDAY FUND Received: On time
Alison Gardner Trustee 01 October 2018 None on record
LIZ MURRAY Trustee
THE SIR HENRY STEPHENSON ENDOWMENT Received: On time
DERWENT COTTAGE HOLIDAY FUND Received: On time
CHERRYTREE Received: On time
CHERRYTREE SUPPORT SERVICES LIMITED Received: On time
SARA MARGARET GOWEN Trustee 16 February 2017
DERWENT COTTAGE HOLIDAY FUND Received: On time
SHEFFIELD PALESTINE WOMEN'S SCHOLARSHIP FUND Received: On time
STEPHEN ALLEN Trustee 01 November 2014
DERWENT COTTAGE HOLIDAY FUND Received: On time
JUNE BLOWER Trustee 19 June 2013 None on record
RACHEL HOPKINS Trustee 09 August 2012 None on record
JOHN FROGGATT BARRY HOPKINS Chair
THE QUEEN VICTORIA AND JOHNSON MEMORIAL TRUST Received: On time
H M BURDALL CHARITY Received: On time
DERWENT COTTAGE HOLIDAY FUND Received: On time
SHEFFIELD BOTANICAL GARDENS TRUST Received: On time
THE FRESHGATE TRUST FOUNDATION Received: 32 days late
SIR GEORGE FRANKLIN'S PENSION CHARITY Received: On time
JIM FULTON Trustee 28 October 2011
THE QUEEN VICTORIA AND JOHNSON MEMORIAL TRUST Received: On time
H M BURDALL CHARITY Received: On time
SHEFFIELD TOWN TRUST Received: On time
DERWENT COTTAGE HOLIDAY FUND Received: On time
SIR GEORGE FRANKLIN'S PENSION CHARITY Received: On time