ASPERGER LONDON AREA GROUP (ALAG)

Charity number: 1160477
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nicholas Stone Trustee 02 January 2020 None on record
Jessika Rittstieg Trustee 02 January 2020 None on record
JOHN HARRISON Chair 31 August 2014 None on record
Jennifer Barker Trustee 01 April 2018 None on record
Dr Jason Crabtree Trustee 01 April 2016 None on record
DESMOND MELDRUM Trustee 14 August 2014 None on record