Financial history KEYNSHAM FOODBANK

Charity number: 1159856
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £1.97k £2.45k £16.99k £82.68k £22.13k
Total expenditure £3.58k £3.79k £8.95k £26.19k £32.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £4.00k N/A