SUPPORTING AFRICAN MATHS INITIATIVES

Charity number: 1161994
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2020 28 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 29 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 28 February 2019 21 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2018 21 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2017 28 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2016 28 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2016 28 December 2016 On time Download