Accounts and annual returns THE GEORGIAN APOSTOLIC AUTOCEPHALOUS ORTHODOX CHURCH IN GREAT BRITAIN

Charity number: 1162145
Charity reporting is overdue by 194 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 29 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 194 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 13 February 2024 105 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 13 February 2024 105 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 07 November 2022 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 07 November 2022 7 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 22 December 2021 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 22 December 2021 52 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 11 May 2021 192 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 11 May 2021 192 days late Download Open in new window