THE GEORGIAN APOSTOLIC AUTOCEPHALOUS ORTHODOX CHURCH IN GREAT BRITAIN

Charity number: 1162145
Charity reporting is up to date (52 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £12.59k £35.77k £32.27k £35.64k £34.64k
Total expenditure £14.79k £36.32k £30.97k £34.13k £30.97k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A