Accounts and annual returns ARDENT THEATRE COMPANY

Charity number: 1161320
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 07 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 07 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 29 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 29 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 04 November 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 18 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 18 November 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 22 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 22 August 2018 On time Download Open in new window