Financial history ARDENT THEATRE COMPANY

Charity number: 1161320
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £33.43k £50.95k £76.13k £7.54k £103.49k
Total expenditure £10.70k £38.76k £68.96k £15.21k £86.10k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £13.50k N/A £24.00k