MARITIME CADET ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1160928
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2021 01 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2020 06 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2019 02 October 2020 244 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2018 08 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2017 19 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2017 Not Required