ZICHRI TOIRAS MOISHE

Charity number: 1160973
Charity reporting is overdue by 1784 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 323 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 323 days
Annual return 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 689 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 689 days
Annual return 31 December 2017 19 November 2018 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1054 days
Annual return 31 December 2016 30 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1419 days
Annual return 31 December 2015 02 March 2017 122 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Overdue Overdue by 1784 days