THE ANSTICE COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1162626
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 18 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 18 November 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 04 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 19 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 16 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 29 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 29 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 21 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 26 January 2018 On time Download