THE FRIENDS OF THE ARCHER ACADEMY

Charity number: 1159750
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £11.10k £13.45k £13.45k £18.59k £1.41k
Total expenditure £4.32k £8.31k £5.72k £13.93k £4.18k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A