Accounts and annual returns YORK TALKING NEWS

Charity number: 505606
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 12 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 20 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 04 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 26 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required