Financial history YORK TALKING NEWS

Charity number: 505606
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.44k £619 £1.73k £695 £1.21k
Total expenditure £1.67k £1.34k £1.25k £1.64k £783
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A