Lifespring

Charity number: 1160962
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Charity is responsible for Lifespring, providing Bible teaching, pastoral care for members and preaching the Gospel of Jesus Christ. We work with Christians Against Poverty in areas such as Debt Advice and lifeskills There is involvement and support for a church in Romania and another in Zambia and surrounding African Countries

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Religious Activities
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • West Sussex
  • Romania
  • Zambia

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 March 2015: CIO registration
  • 15 September 2015: Funds received from 1142267 SILVER RING THING UK
  • 02 July 2020: Funds received from 1002821 THE KING'S CHURCH (HORSHAM)
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • KCH (Working name)
  • KINGS CHURCH HORSHAM (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Michaela Corrine Sargeant Chair 23 April 2019
None on record
Hannah Viet Trustee 22 April 2024
None on record
Daniel Young Trustee 20 March 2024
None on record
Jonathan Sheldon Trustee 16 October 2023
None on record
Jonathan Wintermeyer Trustee 18 July 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £700.63k £516.29k £423.19k £509.63k £624.01k
Total expenditure £671.66k £604.41k £409.98k £559.20k £556.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £300 N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £570.03k £496.22k N/A £504.59k £557.70k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £129.99k £19.78k N/A £5.00k £64.10k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment £604 £294 N/A £38 £2.21k
Income - Other £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £671.66k £604.41k N/A £559.20k £556.02k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £36.24k £35.49k N/A £15.17k £17.31k
Expenditure - Grants institution £119.96k £0 N/A £47.26k £41.30k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 N/A £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Own use assets £868.39k £870.81k N/A £826.12k £799.47k
Long-term investments £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Other assets £297.93k £188.64k N/A £209.35k £306.76k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Total liabilities £29.11k £10.36k N/A £24.11k £26.88k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 24 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 24 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 30 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 30 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 30 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 30 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 04 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 04 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 29 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 29 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Drill Hall
Denne Road
HORSHAM
West Sussex
RH12 1JF
Phone:
01403 254241