Financial history THE WATSON FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1159965
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £12.41k £11.03k £21.41k £11.12k £10.63k
Total expenditure £70.81k £157.42k £121.76k £81.00k £105.21k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A